Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kitsap Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Digiovanni, Tracy Elizabeth, against Hentschell, Aimee B, Hentschell, Theodore R, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Russell W. Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 22: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; 10-9-01406-1; |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 21: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 20: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 19: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 18: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: HENTSCHELL & ASSOCIATES , NFN; |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 17: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
M Motion Docket ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken Not Confirmed and Not Heard 16: HRG STRICKN: NOT CONFIRMD & NOT HRD; |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE RUSSELL W. HARTMAN, DEPT 6; |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment 15: JUDGMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.