Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer, P.S., against Mcclendon, Martin V, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 13: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 14: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: PREDENTIAL CANTERWOOD NORTHWEST , NFN; |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 12: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE ANNA M. LAURIE, DEPT 3; |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Re Service Members Civil Relief 11: AFFIDAV/DECL RE: SVC MBR CIV RELIEF; |
|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 10: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 9: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 2ND; |
|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 8: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: PREDENTIAL CANTERWOOD NORTHWEST , NFN; |
|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 7: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER THURMAN LOWANS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.