Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Napa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Rollins, Fermin, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Victoria D. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2010 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time364 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS)
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order: Show Cause-Enforcement (DCSS) 914223-Order: Show Cause (Enforcement) Motion/OSC Detail: 911170 - Contempt/Failure to Comply Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER: SHOW CAUSE (ENFORCEMENT) [914223] Motion: CONTEMPT/FAILURE TO COMPLY [911170] Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jun 1 2011 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jun 1 2011 Type: 999000 - All Family/DCSS Filings Disposed Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service DECLARATION: DEFAULT [913320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 929120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service REQUEST: DEFAULT [929120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.