Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hoffman, Terrel, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Myers, Michael David, against Preston, Doris, represented by Morgan, Michael T, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2009 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE ANNA M. LAURIE, DEPT 3; |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL; | |
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 10: STIPULATION; |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 9: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 7: STIPULATION TO FILE 1ST AMENDED; COMPLAINT; |
|
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint 8: AMENDED COMPLAINT; |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury 12 Person 6: DEMAND FOR JURY-12 PERSON; |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Jury Demand Received - 12 Jury JURY DEMAND RECEIVED - TWELVE; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Morgan, Michael T; |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 5: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.