Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Card, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Plovie, John P., against Nickel, Christopher L, Nickel, Jane Doe, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2005 |
CategoryTrj Transcript Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: AUTOZONE INCORPORATED , NFN; |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 8: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 7: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; JUDGE ANNA M. LAURIE, DEPT 3; |
|
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 6: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE; |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 5: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT/1ST; |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 4: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 3: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
|
April 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Transcript of Judgment 2: TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT Y5-280CV; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.