Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Abraham, Arthur Rohith, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rodriguez, Grace, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Diane M. Price presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJune 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time83 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Abraham, A. vs. Rodriguez, G. ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Aug 24 2010 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 929120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per REQUEST: DEFAULT [929120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense 933610-Income and Expense Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per INCOME AND EXPENSE [933610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION: DEFAULT [913320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912320-Proof of Service (Petition) Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE (PETITION) [912320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Disclosure 929320-Disclosure Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DISCLOSURE [929320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Add'l Description: Failure to File POS Filed/Issued By: 924110 - Court NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : FAILURE TO FILE POS Filed By COURT [924110] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.