Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Greeves, Gay N filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryEstate - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
WV - Waiver
Date: August 10, 2021DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: March 02, 2021AFPUB - Affidavit of Publication
Date: March 01, 2021DCLCMP - Declaration of Completion
Date: August 10, 2021RCP - Receipt(s)
Date: October 06, 2021NTAPTP - Notice of Appointment and Pendency of Probate
Date: January 21, 2021LTRTS - Letters Testamentary
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: January 21, 2021LWAT - Last Will and Testament
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00NTCRD - Notice to Creditors
Date: January 21, 2021PTPE - Petition to Probate Estate
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: February 18, 2021ORWPRSA - Order Admitting Will Appointing Personal Representative, Adjudicating Solvency & Dir
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00OA - Oath
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.