Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dale, Justin filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryMinor Settlement, Probate/Guardianship (4) - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
RCPBA - Receipt Blocked Account
Date: June 24, 2021MINS - Minutes Motion hearing
Date: April 26, 2021AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00SEALRPT - Sealed Confidential Reports Cover Sheet
Date: April 27, 2021PTAPST - Petition for Approval of Settlement
Date: May 03, 2021ORAPST - Order Approving Settlement
Date: May 19, 2021ORGMT - Order Granting Motion / Petition
Date: June 17, 2021MINS - Minutes Motion hearing
Date: May 19, 2021NTMTDK - Note for Motion Docket
Date: May 03, 2021PTAPGL - Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00ORGMT - Order Granting Motion / Petition
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00NTMTDK - Note for Motion Docket
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PTAPST - Petition for Approval of Settlement
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00ORAPGL - Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00SEALRPT - Sealed Confidential Reports Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.