Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Costello, Hannah Ruth, filed a(n) Dissolution - Commercial case against Costello, Brian Matthew, in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Of Domestic Partnership W/ Children - Active |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeDissolution |
MINS - Minutes Status hearing
Date: February 26, 2021ORDSM - Order of Dismissal
Date: February 22, 2021TMO - Temporary Order
Date: July 31, 2020CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: July 31, 2020CIF - Confidential Information Form
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00ORTSC - Order to Show Cause
Date: January 22, 2021PTDSS - Petition for Dissolution
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.