Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hughes, Carl-Michael William, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Saeteurn, Yien Ching, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with 08/14/2020 08:30 AM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
ORPRT - Order for Protection
Date: September 17, 2020MINS - Minutes Motion hearing
Date: September 17, 2020DCLR - Declaration
Date: September 11, 2020FAULTY - Faulty Document Notice
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: September 11, 2020MINS - Minutes Hearing continued
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: September 11, 2020LTR - Letter
Date: September 11, 2020LTR - Letter
Date: September 11, 2020CRRSP - Correspondence
Date: September 11, 2020DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00LTR - Letter
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00PTORPRT - Petition for Order for Protection
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00LTR - Letter
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00ORMTPO - Order Modifying / Terminating Terms of Protective Order
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00FAULTY - Faulty Document Notice
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Hearing continued
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00XJCD - JIS Check Confidential Document Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00FAULTY - Faulty Document Notice
Date: September 17, 2020RTS - Return of Service
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00ORRTPO - Order Reissuing Temporary Protection Order
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00RPT - Report
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00FAULTY - Faulty Document Notice
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00TMORPRT - Temporary Order for Protection
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00WPSL - Working Papers Submission List
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00XJCD - JIS Check Confidential Document Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00LTR - Letter
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00XJCD - JIS Check Confidential Document Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00XJCD - JIS Check Confidential Document Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00ORRTPO - Order Reissuing Temporary Protection Order
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00RTS - Return of Service
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.