Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dampier, Roderick, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Weinmaster, Douglas T, against Mcreynolds, Christopher, represented by Riley, Kyle D, Wells, Veronica, in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryTort /Motor Vehicle - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NTAA - Notice of Appointment as Arbitrator
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: May 13, 2022ORDSMWP - Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Date: June 01, 2022DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: May 03, 2022AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00ORDYMT - Order Denying Motion / Petition
Date: May 17, 2022AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00ARBA - Arbitration Award
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00CRRSP - Correspondence
Date: May 04, 2022NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: May 02, 2022NTWSUB - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution Of Counsel
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: May 02, 2022CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00SM - Summons
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00CMPTMV - Complaint for Tort - Motor Vehicle
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00STA - Statement of Arbitrability
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.