Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Godwin, Hilary, Godwin, Peter, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Millstein, Seth Edward, against Hdnw Inc, Mark Mehlhaff Co, Navigators Ins Co, Wesco Insurance Co, represented by Friedrich, Paul Keane, Hansen, William Thomas, Lawyer, David James, Lingg, Aloysius Grant, Nierman, Peter, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
ORDSMWP - Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Date: January 13, 2022NTSSTD - Notice of Settlement and Authorization for Clerk to Strike Trial Date
Date: November 10, 2021NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: November 02, 2021ORGPSJ - Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment
Date: October 27, 2021DCLR - Declaration
Date: November 01, 2021AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: November 01, 2021ORPTH - Order to Appear for Pretrial HRG / CONF
Date: October 22, 2021MINS - Minutes Summary judgment
Date: October 22, 2021DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2021-10-11T00:00:00AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2021-10-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00DMJY12 - Demand for Jury - 12 Person
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00ORACS - Order Amending Case Schedule
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00AFSRS - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service - Served
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00CJ - Confirmation of Joinder
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00CMPCOM - Commercial Complaint
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.