Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Litz, Elena, filed a(n) Miscellaneous, Civil (2) - Completed/Re-Completed case represented by Reich, Jordan, against Fca Us, represented by Bain, Douglas G., Gaitan, Jose Edward, Leeper, Virginia, Lenker, John Earl, in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryMiscellaneous, Civil (2) - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
|
ORDSMWP - Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Date: July 12, 2021MTDSM - Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 12, 2021AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: January 05, 2021CRSD - Certificate of Settlement Without Dismissal
Date: March 15, 2021NTSSTD - Notice of Settlement and Authorization for Clerk to Strike Trial Date
Date: March 15, 2021MCCMP - Miscellaneous Civil Complaint/Petition
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: August 07, 2020AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.