Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Casteneda-Gallardo, Jose A, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with 02/04/2021 01:00 PM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryAssault-2 Substantial Bodily Harm - Dv |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORECRP - Order Establishing Conditions of Release
Date: January 26, 2021ORW - Order for Warrant
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00SHRTWA - SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WARRANT OF ARREST
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00OMAPA - Omnibus Application of Prosecuting Attorney
Date: February 04, 2021MINS - Minutes Hearing continued
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00NTA - Notice of Arraignment
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00AT - Attachment
Date: January 26, 2021ORST - Order Setting
Date: February 04, 2021CORNC - Criminal No Contact Order
Date: January 26, 2021NTA - Notice of Arraignment
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00ORNC - No Contact Order
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00NTSCH - Notice of Scheduling
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00ORNC - No Contact Order
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00BN - Bond
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Hearing continued
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00DCLRNS - Declaration of Non-Surrender
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00ORWPNP - Order to Surrender Weapon-CPL Restriction
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00ARRAIGN - Initial Arraignment
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00NTA - Notice of Arraignment
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.