Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Abdi-Mohammed, Abdiweli, represented by Stimmel, Jerry A, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with 01/29/2021 08:30 AM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryAssault-3 Bodily Harm |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: January 29, 2021ORSTD - Order Setting Trial Date
Date: December 28, 2020ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00OMAPA - Omnibus Application of Prosecuting Attorney
Date: December 28, 2020SBNF - Subpoena Non-Fee
Date: February 02, 2021MINS - Minutes Trial continued
Date: January 29, 2021ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00WVSPDT - Waiver of Speedy Trial
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00NTA - Notice of Arraignment
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00SHRTWA - SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WARRANT OF ARREST
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00ORST - Order Setting
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00CORNC - Criminal No Contact Order
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00ARRAIGN - Initial Arraignment
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00ORW - Order for Warrant
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00NTSBC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00OMAD - Omnibus Application by Defendant
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00NTSCH - Notice of Scheduling
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00RQD - Request for Discovery
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00ORECRP - Order Establishing Conditions of Release
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.