Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Austin, Jennifer Wendy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Austin, Brandon Keith, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with Susan Craighead presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryLegal Separation |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
LIST - List
Date: August 20, 2020PTLGSP - Petition for Legal Separation
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00DCLGSP - Decree of Legal Separation
Date: December 19, 2018*ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00NTMDLF - Note for Motion Docket - Late Filing
Date: August 03, 2020CSW - Child Support Worksheet
Date: December 19, 2018MTTC - Motion to Convert
Date: August 20, 2020TMO - Temporary Order
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00CRTC - Certificate of Compliance
Date: December 19, 2018DCLLT - Declaration in Lieu of Testimony
Date: December 19, 2018CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00ORCDC - Order Converting Legal Separation to Final Dissolution Decree
Date: August 20, 2020PP - Parenting Plan (Final Order)
Date: December 19, 2018ORS - Order for Support
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00CIF - Confidential Information Form
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00FNFCL - Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00COPC - Confirmation of Parenting Class
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00COPC - Confirmation of Parenting Class
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.