Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Dettman, Jeray Maurice, represented by Freer, Victoria Ann, Cromwell, Elinor, Findley-Wolf, Natalie D, Kellemen, Joshua Robert, Symms, Jennifer Nicole, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with James D. Cayce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCont Sub-Possess No Prescript |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: December 18, 2020RPTDOC - DOC COURT SPECIAL REPORT
Date: January 22, 2021MINS - Minutes Review hearing
Date: January 22, 2021ORRDR - Order on Residential DOSA Review
Date: January 22, 2021NTWSUB - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution Of Counsel
Date: December 18, 2020NTWSUB - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution Of Counsel
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00ORRVH - Order on Review Hearing
Date: November 13, 2020ORECRP - Order Establishing Conditions of Release
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00VIOR - Violation Report
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Review hearing
Date: November 13, 2020MINS - Minutes Review hearing
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00RPTDOC - DOC COURT SPECIAL REPORT
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Hearing continued
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00ORRVH - Order on Review Hearing
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00RPTDOC - DOC COURT SPECIAL REPORT
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00ORRVH - Order on Review Hearing
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00RPTDOC - DOC COURT SPECIAL REPORT
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Review hearing
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00RPTDOC - DOC COURT SPECIAL REPORT
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00ORRVH - Order on Review Hearing
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00NTWSUB - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution Of Counsel
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Review hearing
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00ORRVH - Order on Review Hearing
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00RPTDOC - DOC COURT SPECIAL REPORT
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00ORRVH - Order on Review Hearing
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Sentencing hearing
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Motion hearing
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00DOSAPSI - DOSA Pre-Sentence Investigation Order
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00ORSRH - Order Setting Review Hearing
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00STPATTY - Statement of Prosecuting Attorney
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00RPT - Report
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00MTAF - Motion and Affidavit / Declaration
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00TCNTU - Trial Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00TCNTU - Trial Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00RTS - Return of Service
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00ORSKTD - Order Striking Trial Date
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00ORPFAI - Order Permitting Filing of Amended Information
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00ORDRFP - Order Directing Fingerprinting
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00FJS - Felony Judgment and Sentence
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00STTDFG - Statement of Defendant on Plea Of Guilty
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00NTIPF - Notice of Ineligibility to Possess a Firearm
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00TCNTU - Trial Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00NTRA - Court’s Notice of Right of Appeal
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00OOR - Omnibus Order
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00TCNTU - Trial Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00TCNTU - Trial Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00AMINF - Amended Information
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00RTS - Return of Service
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00ORTDOSA - Order to Report to Treatment - DOSA
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Trial continued
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00RTS - Return of Service
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Guilty plea only hearing
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00MTAF - Motion and Affidavit / Declaration
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00ORSTD - Order Setting Trial Date
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00SHRTWA - SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WARRANT OF ARREST
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00STAHRG - Status Conference / Hearing
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00NTSCH - Notice of Scheduling
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00BN - Bond
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00OMAPA - Omnibus Application of Prosecuting Attorney
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00ARRAIGN - Initial Arraignment
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00ORW - Order for Warrant
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.