Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank Usa, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bittner, Ashley Brianna, against Holbrook, Kimberly R, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with JUDITH H RAMSEYER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
CategoryCommerical |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
AFNMS - Affidavit of Non-Military Service
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00AFGAR - Affidavit For Garnishment
Date: June 04, 2018ORDFL - Order of Default
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00ANWRGR - Answer to Writ Of Garnishment
Date: October 22, 2018AFNMS - Affidavit of Non-Military Service
Date: December 14, 2017AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00STFJG - Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: February 24, 2020MTDJ - Motion for Default Judgment
Date: December 14, 2017AFGAR - Affidavit For Garnishment
Date: July 03, 2018MTDFL - Motion for Default
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00*ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00ORCJ - Order for Change of Judge
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00DFJG - Default Judgment
Date: December 15, 2017ANWRGR - Answer to Writ Of Garnishment
Date: July 23, 2018AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: December 14, 2017SMCMP - Summons and Complaint
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.