Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alaska Cascade Financial Services Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lee, Peter Sang, against Mayes-Collins, Kelly L, Collins, John P, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with Elizabeth J. Berns presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2020 |
CategoryCollection |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
DFJG - Default Judgment
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00SM - Summons
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00NTWSUB - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution Of Counsel
Date: February 05, 2021DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00*ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00ANWRGR - Answer to Writ Of Garnishment
Date: September 09, 2020AFGAR - Affidavit For Garnishment
Date: September 06, 2017APLWG - Affidavit/Application for Writ of Garnishment-Civil
Date: November 03, 2020CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00ANWRGR - Answer to Writ Of Garnishment
Date: December 09, 2020AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00ORDFL - Order of Default
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00APLWG - Affidavit/Application for Writ of Garnishment-Civil
Date: January 02, 2020EXMPCL - Exemption Claim
Date: December 03, 2020EXMPCL - Exemption Claim
Date: December 02, 2020MTDJ - Motion for Default Judgment
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00ANWRGR - Answer to Writ Of Garnishment
Date: October 30, 2017CMP - Complaint
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00AFNMS - Affidavit of Non-Military Service
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.