Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Gebremical, Henok Tesfai, represented by Leary, Timothy John, Wiggs-Martin, Josephine, Mattson, Nancy Jean, Brandes, Ramona Coral, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with Elizabeth J. Berns presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2020 |
CategoryIdentity Theft-2 |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: February 04, 2021ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: December 03, 2020ORCOMH - Order to Continue Omnibus Hearing
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Motion hearing
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: November 06, 2020ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00ORCOMH - Order to Continue Omnibus Hearing
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00ORCOMH - Order to Continue Omnibus Hearing
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00ORDYMT - Order Denying Motion / Petition
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Hearing continued
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Trial continued
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Trial continued
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00ORPFAI - Order Permitting Filing of Amended Information
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00ORCOMH - Order to Continue Omnibus Hearing
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00AMINF - Amended Information
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Trial continued
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00ORCOMH - Order to Continue Omnibus Hearing
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Trial continued
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00ORCOMH - Order to Continue Omnibus Hearing
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Hearing continued
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00NTWSUB - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution Of Counsel
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00ORCOMH - Order to Continue Omnibus Hearing
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00RTS - Return of Service
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00BN - Bond
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00$RTS - Return of Service (Law Enforcement Agency)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00STAHRG - Status Conference / Hearing
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00ORSTD - Order Setting Trial Date
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00NTWSUB - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution Of Counsel
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00$SHRTBW - Sheriff's Return on Bench Warrant
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00NTWSUB - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution Of Counsel
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00ORSTKS - Order Striking: Setting
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00HSTKIC - Hearing Stricken: In Court Other
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00ORSKTD - Order Striking Trial Date
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00ORIBW - Order Directing Issuance of Bench Warrant
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00SHRTWA - SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WARRANT OF ARREST
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00NTSCH - Notice of Scheduling
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00ORW - Order for Warrant
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00CORNC - Criminal No Contact Order
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00ARRAIGN - Initial Arraignment
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00STAHRG - Status Conference / Hearing
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00ORSTD - Order Setting Trial Date
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00OMAPA - Omnibus Application of Prosecuting Attorney
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00BN - Bond
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.