Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Phillips, Julia A, Calt, Shannon K, against American General Financial Services Inc, Russell, Thomas, Florence Of Seattle, Russell, Janice, Haley, Alice, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with Elizabeth J. Berns presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2020 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
FAULTY - Faulty Document Notice
Date: January 02, 2020CRPRE - Certificate of Purchase of Real Estate
Date: November 12, 2019ORDSM - Order of Dismissal
Date: February 03, 2020OR - Order
Date: January 02, 2020FAULTY - Faulty Document Notice
Date: May 22, 2020SHRERP - Sheriff's Return on Execution of Real Property
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00RCPSCS - RECEIPT OF SHERIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: September 05, 2019MT - Motion
Date: March 21, 2019MAIL - Mail Return - Unclaimed
Date: February 20, 2019ORCFS - Order Confirming Sale
Date: March 21, 2019NTRSS - NOTICE OF RETURN OF SHERIFF'S SALE
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: March 21, 2019PRC - Praecipe
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00CRPRE - Certificate of Purchase of Real Estate
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00AFPUB - Affidavit of Publication
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00PRC - Praecipe
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00ORSP - Order for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00STEVD - Statement of Evidence
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00TRBF - Trial Brief
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00AFPUB - Affidavit of Publication
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00JSR - Joint Status Report
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00EMAIL - Email/s
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00TCNTU - Trial Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00ORPTC - Order on Pre-Trial Conference
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00ORACS - Order Amending Case Schedule
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00AGOR - Agreed Order
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00ORPTH - Order to Appear for Pretrial HRG / CONF
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00ORV - Order Vacating
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00ORGSJ - Order Granting Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00MTCTD - Motion to Change Trial Date
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00CLOD - Clerk's Order of Dismissal
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00ORASR - Order on Assignment / Reassignment
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00ORASR - Order on Assignment / Reassignment
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00ORSTAC - Order on Status Conference
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00ORCJ - Order for Change of Judge
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00ORPTH - Order to Appear for Pretrial HRG / CONF
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00SMJHRG - Summary Judgment Hearing
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00RPY - Reply
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00AN - Answer
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00DIS - Disclosure
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00RPY - Reply
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00RSP - Response
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00MTAF - Motion and Affidavit / Declaration
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00RSP - Response
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00MTSMJG - Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00RQ - Request
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00MTSMJG - Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00ORDFL - Order of Default
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00ORACS - Order Amending Case Schedule
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00MTDFL - Motion for Default
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00AFNMS - Affidavit of Non-Military Service
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00ORPTH - Order to Appear for Pretrial HRG / CONF
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00NTASCC - Notice of Association of Counsel
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00MTCTD - Motion to Change Trial Date
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00ORDFL - Order of Default
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00ORDYMT - Order Denying Motion / Petition
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00MTDFL - Motion for Default
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00ORDYMT - Order Denying Motion / Petition
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00AFNMS - Affidavit of Non-Military Service
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00JD - Judgment
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00RTS - Return of Service
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00RPY - Reply
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00RSP - Response
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00FNFCL - Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00ORDYMT - Order Denying Motion / Petition
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00SM - Summons
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00RPY - Reply
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00OR - Order
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00OB - Objection / Opposition
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00MTDFL - Motion for Default
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00ORDFL - Order of Default
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00AFPUB - Affidavit of Publication
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00AT - Attachment
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00DCLRM - Declaration of Mailing
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00MTDFL - Motion for Default
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00CMP - Complaint
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00ORPUB - Order for Publication
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00ANCC - Answer and Counter Claim
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00APPS - Appearance Pro Se
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00SM - Summons
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00WL - Witness List
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00RTS - Return of Service
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00STP - Stipulation
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00NTIWD - Notice of Intent to Withdraw
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00JDDF - Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00SM - Summons
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00*ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.