Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mohamed, Mohamed I, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Perkins, Dean Standish Jr, Cohodes, Susan Beth, against Pesos Kitchen & Lounge, Ozzies Restaurant, Otte, Shannon, represented by Lee, Marvin Min-Sup, Horey, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with JUDITH H RAMSEYER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryTort /Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: September 14, 2020ORGSJ - Order Granting Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00DISW - Disclosure of Witnesses
Date: September 14, 2020ORDSMWP - Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Date: December 30, 2020ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: August 24, 2020AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00NTMTDK - Note for Motion Docket
Date: August 18, 2020RSP - Response
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00ORACS - Order Amending Case Schedule
Date: August 24, 2020STP - Stipulation
Date: August 18, 2020MTSMJG - Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00RSP - Response
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00RSP - Response
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00DIS - Disclosure
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00WL - Witness List
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00ORGLA - Order Granting Leave to Amend
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00DFLW - Defendant 's List of Witnesses
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00MTCTD - Motion to Change Trial Date
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00NTAB - Notice of Absence / Unavailability
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00AMCPT - Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00DFLW - Defendant 's List of Witnesses
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00DISW - Disclosure of Witnesses
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00DISW - Disclosure of Witnesses
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00AMSM - Amended Summons
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00ORACS - Order Amending Case Schedule
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00MTCTD - Motion to Change Trial Date
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00NTMTDK - Note for Motion Docket
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00JN - Joinder
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00DFLW - Defendant 's List of Witnesses
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00DFLW - Defendant 's List of Witnesses
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00WL - Witness List
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00WL - Witness List
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00ORACS - Order Amending Case Schedule
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00ORACS - Order Amending Case Schedule
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00NTIWD - Notice of Intent to Withdraw
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00NTAB - Notice of Absence / Unavailability
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00ORACS - Order Amending Case Schedule
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00MTCTD - Motion to Change Trial Date
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00$JDR12 - Jury Demand Received - Twelve
Date: 2017-01-30T00:00:00MTCTD - Motion to Change Trial Date
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00ORCJ - Order for Change of Judge
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00SM - Summons
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00NTAB - Notice of Absence / Unavailability
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00ORPTH - Order to Appear for Pretrial HRG / CONF
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00ORACS - Order Amending Case Schedule
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00ORCJ - Order for Change of Judge
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00CJ - Confirmation of Joinder
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00CMP - Complaint
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00ORGMT - Order Granting Motion / Petition
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00*ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00NTAB - Notice of Absence / Unavailability
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00NTWSUB - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution Of Counsel
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.