Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Himor, Melody Christiana A, represented by Brown Lee, Deborah, Reed, Katy Anne, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with James D. Cayce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryCont Sub-Possess No Prescript |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: February 16, 2021NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: February 16, 2021SHRTBW - Sheriff's Return on A Bench Warrant
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00NTA - Notice of Arraignment
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00SHRTBW - Sheriff's Return on A Bench Warrant
Date: February 16, 2021INFO - Information
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Hearing continued
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00ORIBW - Order Directing Issuance of Bench Warrant
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: February 12, 2021ARRAIGN - Initial Arraignment
Date: February 12, 2021$BR - Bonds Received
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00SHRTNS - Sheriff’s Return of Service – Not Served
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00$SHRTS - Sheriff's Return of Service with Fees Assessed
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00ORIBW - Order Directing Issuance of Bench Warrant
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00NTA - Notice of Arraignment
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Motion hearing
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Hearing continued
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00ORECRP - Order Establishing Conditions of Release
Date: February 12, 2021ORIBW - Order Directing Issuance of Bench Warrant
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00ORSTD - Order Setting Trial Date
Date: 2021-02-12T00:00:00ORDCLDC - Order Declining Drug Court
Date: 2021-02-12T00:00:00BN - Bond
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00$SHRTBW - Sheriff's Return on Bench Warrant
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00NTA - Notice of Arraignment
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00MINS - Minutes Motion hearing
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00ORISM - Order for Issuance of Summons
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00ORA - Order on Arraignment
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00NTA - Notice of Arraignment
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.