Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wechsler, Melissa Birrittella, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wechsler, Jeremy Dylan, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with Elizabeth J. Berns presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
STFJG - Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: January 14, 2021RPT - Report
Date: September 16, 2016RPT - Report
Date: November 15, 2016RPT - Report
Date: November 15, 2016RPT - Report
Date: August 11, 2016RPT - Report
Date: October 18, 2016CRTC - Certificate of Compliance
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00NTIWD - Notice of Intent to Withdraw
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00RPT - Report
Date: July 22, 2016NTIWD - Notice of Intent to Withdraw
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00PP - Parenting Plan (Final Order)
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00RPT - Report
Date: August 08, 2016FNFCL - Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00RPT - Report
Date: June 21, 2016RPT - Report
Date: March 14, 2016ORPTC - Order on Pre-Trial Conference
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00ORS - Order for Support
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00DCD - Decree of Dissolution
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00NTSSTD - Notice of Settlement and Authorization for Clerk to Strike Trial Date
Date: 2015-05-20T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00NTAB - Notice of Absence / Unavailability
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00LIST - List
Date: 2014-12-05T00:00:00NTAB - Notice of Absence / Unavailability
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00ORTA - Case Schedule Not Followed
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00ORPTH - Order to Appear for Pretrial HRG / CONF
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00DIS - Disclosure
Date: 2015-03-16T00:00:00RSP - Response
Date: 2014-12-29T00:00:00MTRC - Motion for Reconsideration
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00RSP - Response
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00ORRR - Order Revising Ruling
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00ORCJ - Order for Change of Judge
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00ORDYMT - Order Denying Motion / Petition
Date: 2014-09-30T00:00:00COPC - Confirmation of Parenting Class
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00TMO - Temporary Order
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00CI - Confirmation of Issues
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00ORAP - Order Appointing
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-08-13T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00CRRSP - Correspondence
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00NTMTDK - Note for Motion Docket
Date: 2014-08-01T00:00:00ORFR - Order on Motion for Revision of Court Commissioner’s Ruling
Date: 2014-09-16T00:00:00TMORS - TEMPORARY ORDER OF CHILD SUPPORT
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00RSP - Response
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00COPC - Confirmation of Parenting Class
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00RSP - Response
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00NTAB - Notice of Absence / Unavailability
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2014-07-18T00:00:00PPT - Parenting Plan Temporary
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00MTFR - Motion for Revision
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00TMO - Temporary Order
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2014-07-23T00:00:00SEALPHC - Sealed Personal Health Care Records Cover Sheet
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00FNDCLR - Financial Declaration
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00SEALFN - Sealed Financial Source Document(s)
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00OB - Objection / Opposition
Date: 2014-09-15T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00MTAF - Motion and Affidavit / Declaration
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00*ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00MEXRSC - Motion/Declaration for Ex Parte Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00PTDSS - Petition for Dissolution
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00SEALFN - Sealed Financial Source Document(s)
Date: 2014-07-17T00:00:00PPP - Proposed Parenting Plan
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00FNDCLR - Financial Declaration
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00NTMTDK - Note for Motion Docket
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00CIF - Confidential Information Form
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00DCLSPP - Declaration in Supp of Parenting Plan
Date: 2014-07-16T00:00:00RSTOSC - Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00SM - Summons
Date: 2014-07-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.