Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Lintz, Nicholas Ray, represented by Zangri, Anuradha Janet, Carney, Christopher R, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with James D. Cayce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2021 |
CategoryComm W/Minor-Immoral Prev Conv |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDYMT - Order Denying Motion / Petition
Date: 2013-07-02T00:00:00ORPFAI - Order Permitting Filing of Amended Information
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: February 10, 2014NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2013-06-27T00:00:00ORCNTS - Order for Continuance: Setting
Date: 2013-06-27T00:00:00AMINF - Amended Information
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00STPATTY - Statement of Prosecuting Attorney
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00GPOH - Guilty Plea Only Hearing
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2013-07-02T00:00:00NTRA - Court’s Notice of Right of Appeal
Date: July 26, 2013MTWVF - Motion for Waiver of Fees
Date: February 25, 2021ORSXP - Order for Sexual Assault Protection
Date: July 26, 2013NTIPF - Notice of Ineligibility to Possess a Firearm
Date: 2013-07-26T00:00:00SNTHRG - Sentencing Hearing
Date: 2013-07-26T00:00:00ORWILFO - Order Waiving Interest on Legal Financial Obligations
Date: February 25, 2021STTDFG - Statement of Defendant on Plea Of Guilty
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00MTAF - Motion and Affidavit / Declaration
Date: January 25, 2021NT - Notice
Date: June 29, 2016FJS - Felony Judgment and Sentence
Date: 2013-07-26T00:00:00ORRL - Order of Release
Date: 2013-07-26T00:00:00NTSCH - Notice of Scheduling
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00ORW - Order for Warrant
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00$SHRTWA - Sheriff's Return on Warrant of Arrest
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00ARRAIGN - Initial Arraignment
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: 2013-06-20T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2013-05-30T00:00:00CORNC - Criminal No Contact Order
Date: 2013-06-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.