Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Norton, Jason Anthony, represented by Mccabe, Kevin P, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with James E. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryProtection Order Viol-Prev Conv - Dv |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: June 30, 2021ORDSM - Order of Dismissal
Date: December 16, 2014$SHRTWA - Sheriff's Return on Warrant of Arrest
Date: December 24, 2014ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: November 19, 2014ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: October 28, 2014HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: November 19, 2014HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2014-10-08T00:00:00HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2014-07-10T00:00:00HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2014-08-14T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2012-07-31T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2014-07-10T00:00:00NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: 2014-09-11T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2014-09-23T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2014-10-08T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2014-08-14T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00ORW - Order for Warrant
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.