Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Helgeson, Michael, Vuletic, Simona, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Mckissic, Darrell, represented by Bendele, Levi Lewis Iii, in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts with Monica J. Benton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonica J. Benton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryTort /Motor Vehicle - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | MND - Mandate | |
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTE - Comment Entry | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | 707210 CP/ BENDELE PD 4-19-13 | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERK'S PAPERS - FEE RECEIVED 40.50 | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | INX - Index | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | 69515-1 / BENDELE | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | PGS 256-286 TRANS COA 4-22-13 | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | DSGCKP - Designation of Clerk's Papers | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | CRRSP - Correspondence | |
March 28, 2013 | Docket Event | DEP - Deposition of |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.