Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hougland, Kendall, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by O'Donnell, James Edward, against Adem, Haron, Mensur, Nuru, On Time Transportation, Veolia Transportation Services Inc, in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts with Mary I. Yu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary I. Yu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2011 |
CategoryTort /Motor Vehicle - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | EXD - Exhibits Destroyed | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ABDOL - Abstract of Court Record to Department Of Licensing | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | ABDOL - Abstract of Court Record to Department Of Licensing | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | STFJG - Satisfaction of Judgment | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | FNFCL - Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | JDV - Judgment on Verdict | |
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | STPORE - Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits and / or Unopened Depositions | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | CTINJY - Court's Instructions To Jury | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | SPV - Special Verdict | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | EXLST - Exhibit List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.