Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hammer, Isaac L, against Love, Glenn A, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with James D. Cayce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCommerical |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
NT - Notice
Date: February 04, 2021OREXTJD - Order Extending Judgment
Date: February 05, 2021PTEXJD - Motion/Petition to Extend Judgment
Date: February 04, 2021AFGAR - Affidavit For Garnishment
Date: June 26, 2017AFGAR - Affidavit For Garnishment
Date: May 05, 2015ORCD - Order Compelling Discovery
Date: September 18, 2013MTFEJD - Motion and Affidavit for Examination of Judgment Debtor
Date: September 17, 2013HSTKNA - Hearing Stricken: In Court Nonappear
Date: 2012-08-24T00:00:00ORSUP - Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2012-07-17T00:00:00MTFEJD - Motion and Affidavit for Examination of Judgment Debtor
Date: 2012-07-17T00:00:00JDAGD - Judgment Against Garnishee Defendant
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00NTPRES - Notice of Presentation
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00ANWRGR - Answer to Writ Of Garnishment
Date: 2011-11-07T00:00:00$AFG - Affidavit of Garnishment
Date: 2011-09-22T00:00:00JDAGD - Judgment Against Garnishee Defendant
Date: 2011-12-16T00:00:00NTPRES - Notice of Presentation
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00ANWRGR - Answer to Writ Of Garnishment
Date: 2011-07-26T00:00:00ANWRGR - Answer to Writ Of Garnishment
Date: 2012-04-30T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2011-12-15T00:00:00$AFG - Affidavit of Garnishment
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00$AFG - Affidavit of Garnishment
Date: 2012-04-09T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2011-03-29T00:00:00NTACA - Notice of Address Change
Date: 2011-04-19T00:00:00SMCMP - Summons and Complaint
Date: 2011-03-29T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: 2011-04-19T00:00:00MTDJ - Motion for Default Judgment
Date: 2011-04-19T00:00:00*ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule
Date: 2011-03-29T00:00:00DFJG - Default Judgment
Date: 2011-04-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.