Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Daniel, Enid Rose filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2009 |
CategoryEstate - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | NTACA - Notice of Address Change | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | DCLCMP - Declaration of Completion | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | INVAP - Inventory and Appraisement | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | EXP0001 EX-PARTE, DEPT | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | AUDIO LOG DR 325-3 | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDYMT - Order Denying Motion / Petition | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | DCLR - Declaration | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | MTHRG - Motion Hearing | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | PT - Petition | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CRDCLM - Creditor's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.