Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Freeman, Tyler Dean, represented by Franklin, Christopher M, in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts with Cheryl B. Carey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCheryl B. Carey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCriminal - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NT - Notice | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | MM - Memorandum | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | ORNC - No Contact Order | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | FJS - Felony Judgment and Sentence | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | NTIPF - Notice of Ineligibility to Possess a Firearm | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | SNTHRG - Sentencing Hearing | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | NTRA - Court’s Notice of Right of Appeal | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | CR DAVE ERWIN | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | JDG0008 JUDGE JAY V. WHITE, DEPT 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.