Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts with Laura C. Inveen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura C. Inveen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCriminal - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event | DSRR - Disposition Report Received | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | DSRR - Disposition Report Received | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | STPATTY - Statement of Prosecuting Attorney | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | FJS - Felony Judgment and Sentence | |
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NTRA - Court’s Notice of Right of Appeal | |
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NTIPF - Notice of Ineligibility to Possess a Firearm | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | SNTRC - Sentence Recommendation | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | STPATTY - Statement of Prosecuting Attorney | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | TOTAL COURT COSTS =$ 215.50 | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | NTIWD - Notice of Intent to Withdraw |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.