Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dynamic Strategies Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Williams, Brad Lyle, against Compton, Kay F, Compton, Patrick Jame, in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategoryTranscript Of Judgment - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | STFJG - Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | RL - Release | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | AFGAR - Affidavit For Garnishment | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | EXP0002 EX-PARTE, DEPT - MAIL | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | JDAGD - Judgment Against Garnishee Defendant | |
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event | AFNMS - Affidavit of Non-Military Service | |
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | AFGAR - Affidavit For Garnishment | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | AFML - Affidavit of Mailing | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | AFNMS - Affidavit of Non-Military Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.