Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hoang, Hoa, Truong, Charlie, Valley Narcotics Enforcement Team, filed a(n) Seizure Of Property From Commission Of A Crime case represented by Taylor, Michele Ann, against 23030 100Th Ave Se Kent, King County, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with Matthew York presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2007 |
CategorySeizure Of Property From Commission Of A Crime |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
|
AGOR - Agreed Order
Date: April 18, 2007ORCTD - Order for Continuance of Trial Date
Date: March 12, 2007ORDSMWP - Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Date: April 18, 2007MTCTD - Motion to Change Trial Date
Date: March 01, 2007RSP - Response
Date: March 08, 2007RSP - Response
Date: March 07, 2007AF - Affidavit
Date: March 01, 2007CL - Claim
Date: March 07, 2007NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2007-02-20T00:00:00AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: March 07, 2007NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2007-03-01T00:00:00NTHG - Notice of Hearing
Date: 2007-02-09T00:00:00CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2006-10-27T00:00:00MTDSM - Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2007-02-09T00:00:00ORAU - Order Authorizing
Date: 2006-10-27T00:00:00LSPND - Lis Pendens
Date: 2006-10-27T00:00:00CRRSP - Correspondence
Date: 2006-11-30T00:00:00NTAPR - Notice of Appearance
Date: 2006-11-16T00:00:00*ORSCS - Order Setting Case Schedule
Date: 2006-10-27T00:00:00SMCMP - Summons and Complaint
Date: 2006-10-27T00:00:00DCLR - Declaration
Date: 2006-10-27T00:00:00ORTSC - Order to Show Cause
Date: 2006-10-27T00:00:00ORCNS - Order Consolidating Cases
Date: 2007-02-06T00:00:00MT - Motion
Date: 2006-10-27T00:00:00MM - Memorandum
Date: 2006-10-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.