Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Custer, Lisa Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Buswell, Jerry Lee, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with MF-Family Law Motions presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2006 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
AFSR - Affidavit / Declaration / Certificate Of Service
Date: December 05, 2006SHRTS - Sheriff's Return on Service
Date: December 13, 2006MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: December 01, 2006ORPRT - Order for Protection
Date: December 01, 2006RTS - Return of Service
Date: November 20, 2006CICS - Case Information Cover Sheet
Date: 2006-10-30T00:00:00RTS - Return of Service
Date: 2006-11-07T00:00:00HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: November 13, 2006ORRTPO - Order Reissuing Temporary Protection Order
Date: 2006-11-13T00:00:00TMORPRT - Temporary Order for Protection
Date: 2006-10-30T00:00:00PTORPRT - Petition for Order for Protection
Date: 2006-10-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.