Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Green, Albert Thai, represented by Gruenhagen, Todd M, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryCont Sub-Possess No Prescript |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AC - Acknowledgment
Date: February 24, 2009STTDFG - Statement of Defendant on Plea Of Guilty
Date: March 30, 2007OAPJPS - Order, Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore and Stipulation
Date: March 29, 2007FJS - Felony Judgment and Sentence
Date: March 30, 2007NTRA - Court’s Notice of Right of Appeal
Date: March 29, 2007NTIPF - Notice of Ineligibility to Possess a Firearm
Date: March 29, 2007NTAS - Notice of Assignment
Date: March 29, 2007GPSH - Guilty Plea And Sentencing Hearing
Date: March 29, 2007HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2007-03-15T00:00:00HCNTU - Hearing Continued: Unspecified
Date: 2007-03-22T00:00:00OAPJPS - Order, Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore and Stipulation
Date: 2007-03-15T00:00:00$SHRTBW - Sheriff's Return on Bench Warrant
Date: 2007-02-23T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2007-02-23T00:00:00NTSCH - Notice of Scheduling
Date: 2007-02-23T00:00:00DSRR - Disposition Report Received
Date: 2007-02-20T00:00:00SHRTS - Sheriff's Return on Service
Date: 2007-01-10T00:00:00ORIBW - Order Directing Issuance of Bench Warrant
Date: 2006-12-27T00:00:00$SHRTS - Sheriff's Return of Service with Fees Assessed
Date: 2006-12-21T00:00:00ORIS - Order to Issue
Date: 2006-12-18T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2006-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.