Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Rocha, Vivian Ann, represented by Tackitt, Mark B, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategoryCont Subs Schd I/Ii-Narc/Iv-Fln |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NT - Notice
Date: January 18, 2011OREXT - Order Extending
Date: July 03, 2007STTDFG - Statement of Defendant on Plea Of Guilty
Date: July 03, 2007MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: July 03, 2007OAPJPS - Order, Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore and Stipulation
Date: July 03, 2007OREXB - Order Exonerating Bail / Bond
Date: June 29, 2007AMINF - Amended Information
Date: July 03, 2007DSRR - Disposition Report Received
Date: June 14, 2007NTRA - Court’s Notice of Right of Appeal
Date: 2007-05-29T00:00:00FJS - Felony Judgment and Sentence
Date: 2007-05-30T00:00:00ORWR - Order for Work Release
Date: 2007-05-29T00:00:00GPSH - Guilty Plea And Sentencing Hearing
Date: 2007-05-29T00:00:00NTIPF - Notice of Ineligibility to Possess a Firearm
Date: 2007-05-29T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2007-05-25T00:00:00OAPJPS - Order, Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore and Stipulation
Date: 2007-05-29T00:00:00OAPJPS - Order, Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore and Stipulation
Date: 2007-05-24T00:00:00$SHRTBW - Sheriff's Return on Bench Warrant
Date: 2007-03-27T00:00:00OAPJPS - Order, Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore and Stipulation
Date: 2007-05-14T00:00:00NTSCH - Notice of Scheduling
Date: 2007-03-27T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2007-03-27T00:00:00ORIS - Order to Issue
Date: 2006-12-26T00:00:00BN - Bond
Date: 2007-03-26T00:00:00$SHRTS - Sheriff's Return of Service with Fees Assessed
Date: 2006-12-29T00:00:00ORIBW - Order Directing Issuance of Bench Warrant
Date: 2007-01-04T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2006-12-26T00:00:00OAPJPS - Order, Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore and Stipulation
Date: 2007-03-26T00:00:00SHRTS - Sheriff's Return on Service
Date: 2007-01-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.