Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Landers, Michelle Lea, represented by Leone, Lisa M, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with William L. Downing presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryControlled Substance Violation |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NT - Notice
Date: July 20, 2012NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: May 04, 2007AMINF - Amended Information
Date: February 14, 2007FJS - Felony Judgment and Sentence
Date: February 14, 2007STTDFG - Statement of Defendant on Plea Of Guilty
Date: February 14, 2007NTIPF - Notice of Ineligibility to Possess a Firearm
Date: February 13, 2007NTAS - Notice of Assignment
Date: February 13, 2007NTRL - Notice of Release
Date: February 13, 2007GPSH - Guilty Plea And Sentencing Hearing
Date: 2007-02-13T00:00:00NTRA - Court’s Notice of Right of Appeal
Date: 2007-02-13T00:00:00ARRAIGN - Initial Arraignment
Date: 2007-01-24T00:00:00ORECRP - Order Establishing Conditions of Release
Date: 2006-12-19T00:00:00$SHRTBW - Sheriff's Return on Bench Warrant
Date: 2007-01-30T00:00:00NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: 2007-01-25T00:00:00DSRR - Disposition Report Received
Date: 2007-01-31T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2006-12-22T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2006-12-19T00:00:00ORDYMT - Order Denying Motion / Petition
Date: 2007-01-24T00:00:00ORIBW - Order Directing Issuance of Bench Warrant
Date: 2006-12-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.