Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against Nicdao, Mario Antonio, represented by Malat, Jill Amie, in the jurisdiction of King County. This case was filed in King County Superior Courts with Gregory P. Canova presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryCriminal - Completed/Re-Completed |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2013 | Docket Event | VIOR - Violation Report | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event | FJS - Felony Judgment and Sentence | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | JDG0021 JUDGE GREG CANOVA, DEPT 21 | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | VIDEO LOG 817-07-149/ 1:36:17 | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | SNTHRG - Sentencing Hearing | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | NTRA - Court’s Notice of Right of Appeal | |
October 12, 2007 | Docket Event | NTIPF - Notice of Ineligibility to Possess a Firearm | |
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event | SNTRC - Sentence Recommendation | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | S/D: 10/12/07- CANOVA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.