Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by King County, Prosecuting Atty, against East, Eric Glenn, represented by Mordekhova, Evgeniya D, in the jurisdiction of King County, WA, . King County, WA Superior Courts with J. Wesley Saint Clair presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryCont Sub-Possess No Prescription |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKing County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
MAIL - Mail Return - Unclaimed
Date: January 23, 2013NTWDA - Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Date: August 10, 2007MAIL - Mail Return - Unclaimed
Date: January 18, 2013NT - Notice
Date: December 31, 2012STTDFG - Statement of Defendant on Plea Of Guilty
Date: June 25, 2007AC - Acknowledgment
Date: July 26, 2007OAPJPS - Order, Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore and Stipulation
Date: June 25, 2007NTAS - Notice of Assignment
Date: June 25, 2007NTRA - Court’s Notice of Right of Appeal
Date: June 25, 2007GPSH - Guilty Plea And Sentencing Hearing
Date: 2007-06-25T00:00:00JDOSSG - Judgment and Order Suspending Sentence and Granting Probation
Date: 2007-06-25T00:00:00AMINF - Amended Information
Date: 2007-06-25T00:00:00$SHRTBW - Sheriff's Return on Bench Warrant
Date: 2007-05-04T00:00:00ORCNT - Order of Continuance
Date: 2007-05-10T00:00:00OAPJPS - Order, Oath and Approval of Judge Pro Tempore and Stipulation
Date: 2007-05-08T00:00:00DSRR - Disposition Report Received
Date: 2007-05-01T00:00:00NT - Notice
Date: 2007-05-02T00:00:00NTARD - Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery
Date: 2007-05-01T00:00:00DCL - Declination
Date: 2007-04-26T00:00:00ARRAIGN - Initial Arraignment
Date: 2007-04-26T00:00:00ORECRP - Order Establishing Conditions of Release
Date: 2007-04-26T00:00:00INFO - Information
Date: 2006-12-15T00:00:00MTHRG - Motion Hearing
Date: 2006-12-22T00:00:00ORECRP - Order Establishing Conditions of Release
Date: 2006-12-15T00:00:00ORIBW - Order Directing Issuance of Bench Warrant
Date: 2006-12-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.