Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Posey, Liston Randolph, Ii, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Hell'S Angels, Inc., Svornich, Dominick, Hageman, Brian, Ferguson, Bob, represented by Dickey, Seth Evan, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WA, . Jefferson County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition -Plaintiff's |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Minutes |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing to Subpoena Witnesses or Add Defendants Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Seth E Dickey |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket and Declaration, Allegations, Requests, Notice, etc. |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.