Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Moegling, Barbara, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Huelsman, Melissa Ann, against Barry & Bernice Buehler Family Trust, Doe Defendant 1-20, Penta, Vincent L, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WA, . Jefferson County, WA Superior Courts with Keith C. Harper presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2017 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Funds in the Court Registry |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing Minutes |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Summary Judgment | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Facsimile |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Note for Calendar | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Minutes |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Summary Judgment Judge: Harper, Keith C |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Facsimle-FAX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.