Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Camfield, Donna J, Camfield, Russell E, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Sackett, Anne, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, WA, . Jefferson County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER PEGGY ANN BIERBAUM; |
|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion 11: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL; |
|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice 12: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; |
|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 8: NOTICE OF ISSUE; 05-27-2011; NOTE FOR TRIAL SETTING HEARING; |
|
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Courts Request -: HEARING CANCELLED: COURT'S REQUEST; |
|
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Trial Date 10: ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL DATE; OCTOBER 3-4, 2011 @ 9:00 AM; |
|
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Issue 9: NOTICE OF ISSUE; NOTE FOR TRIAL SETTING; |
|
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Issue 8: NOTICE OF ISSUE; 05-27-2011; NOTE FOR TRIAL SETTING HEARING; |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 6: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.