Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alan Licht Trust, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Arndt, Charles Reed, against Hallen, Steven, Hallen, Suzanne, Whidbey Island Ventures Inc, represented by Thompson, Thomas Alfred, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Christon C. Skinner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChriston C. Skinner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial TRIAL 4/21/2021 3-DAYS 9:30AM Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Readiness Hearing
Judge: Skinner, Christon C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.