Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
U.S Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Smith, Nathan Frederick Jon, against Arciaga, Michael Viado, Arcianga, Vivian C., in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Vickie I. Churchill presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVickie I. Churchill Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2018 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Execution of Property | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Confirming Sale
Judge: Churchill, Vickie I |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF NATHAN F SMITH |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte
Judge: Churchill, Vickie I |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER CONFIRMING SALE |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF FILING RETURN ON SALE OF REAL PROPERTY |
|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Order of Sale | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Copy SHERIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF SALE |
|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Hancock, Alan R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.