Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pettis, Katrina Jill filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Alan R. Hancock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlan R. Hancock Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2017 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Report SEA MAR |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Modifying Terminating Terms of Protective Order
Judge: Harvey, H. Clarke |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Confirmation of Service TO ICSO |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration TO TERMINATE ORDER |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Confidential Information Form | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Protection Order Re: Protected Party's Motion to Rescind/Terminate DVPO Judge: Hancock, Alan R |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 8: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Confirmation of Service 11: CONFIRMATION OF SERVICE - ICSO; |
|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 10: MOTION HEARING; COMMISSIONER H. CLARKE HARVEY; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.