Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kelch, Joshua A, Kelch, Kristina N Husband & Wife, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against All Persons Residing At 2036 Rockcress Lane Oak Harbor, Rogers, Randall Leon, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Vickie I. Churchill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2010 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trust Fund Disbursed -: TRUST FUND DISBURSED ($350.17); |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trust Fund Disbursed -: TRUST FUND DISBURSED ($432.59); |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 34: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; JUDGE VICKIE I. CHURCHILL; |
|
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 33: MILITARY DECLARATION; |
|
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 32: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing 31: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; |
|
August 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letter 30: LETTER TO COUNSEL; |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letter 29: LETTER TO COUNSEL; |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letter 28: LETTER TO COUNSEL; |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Letter 27: LETTER TO COUNSEL; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.