Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na As Trustee For, Abfc Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-He1, The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Occupants Of The Premises, Any Person Or Parties Claiming Right, Title In Real Property, Mentzos, Michele, Goss Lake Park Community Club, Mentzos, Dennis Deceased, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Vickie I. Churchill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2010 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 33: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE VICKIE I. CHURCHILL; |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 32: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
June 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Order of Sale 31: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON ORDER OF SALE; |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 29: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 30: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 28: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 27: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ 26: WRIT FOR ORDER OF SALE; |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Praecipe 25: PRAECIPE FOR ORDER OF SALE; |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order 24: ORDER TO AMEND THE CASE CAPTION; JUDGE VICKIE I. CHURCHILL; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.