Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Krieg Construction Inc A Washington Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Skinner, Christon Clark, against Goldwood, Jane Doe Husband And Wife, Goldwood, Gary, Goodstein, Jane Doe Husband & Wife, Goodstein, Andrew, Rose Hill Associates Llc A Wa Limited Liability Company, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Alan R. Hancock presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2010 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Closure for Want of Prosecution 29: CLERK'S ORDER OF CLOSURE; JUDGE ALAN R. HANCOCK; |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution 28: CLKS MOT FOR DISMISS FR WNT OF PROS; |
|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition 26: ORDER GRANTING MOTION/PETITION; JUDGE ALAN R. HANCOCK; |
|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 27: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
LH Civil Motions MT FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing Continued Plaintiff Prosecutor Requested 25: CONTINUED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; JUDGE ALAN R. HANCOCK; COURT REPORTER JEANNE M WELLS; |
|
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Reply 23: REPLY TO DEF RESPONSE; |
|
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 24: DECLARATION DON KRIEG; |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Letter 22: LETTER FROM CLERK; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.