Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lenart, Thomas, Lenart, Sylvia Husband & Wife, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against New Centry Mortgage Corp A California Corporation, Robbins & Herber Inc Ps A Washington Corporation, Griswold, Edward, Herber, Julie M S An Individual, Griswold, Margaret Both Individualy & Marital Comm, (total of 9) See All represented by Cohen, Jacob, in the jurisdiction of Island County, WA, . Island County, WA Superior Courts with Alan R. Hancock presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2010 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIsland County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice 58: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; JUDGE ALAN R. HANCOCK; |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) -: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE; 02-02-2010; TRIAL 4 DAYS 1ST SET CIVIL 9:30 AM; STRICKEN PER ORDER 12/08/09; |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
T Trial Assignments TRIAL ASSIGNMENT |
|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 53: NOTICE OF READINESS HRG; 01-11-2010; READINESS HEARING; |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Striking Trial Date 57: STIPULATION & ORDER STRIKING TRIAL; DATE; JUDGE VICKIE I. CHURCHILL; |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Letter 56: RETURN LETTER; |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) -: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE; 10-27-2009; TRIAL 4 DAYS 1ST SET CIVIL 9:30 AM; STRIKE PER ORDER 8/6/09; |
|
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 30: NOTICE OF READINESS HEARING; 10-12-2009; READINESS HEARING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.